U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00742
  • Case Name: Herron v. Walmart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • August 05, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • July 27, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • July 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.