U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00753
  • Case Name: Shatar Holdings LLC v. Farzaneh
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment Debtor Exam]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Bill of Costs Hearing set]
  • June 28, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • June 28, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 28, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2022: [Witness List]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • May 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • January 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • January 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • January 03, 2022: [Witness List]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
  • September 01, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 31, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • July 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.