U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00759
  • Case Name: Pair et al v. Postal Fleet Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 01, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • November 01, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Stay Case]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2022: [Stay Case]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Stay Case]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 27, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Certify]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • September 14, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.