U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Shakur v. City of Moore Oklahoma et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 21, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 07, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 26, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 20, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Complaint]
  • July 30, 2021: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.