U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00757
  • Case Name: Kimmell v. American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 06, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 05, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 05, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 22, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 02, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Leave]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.