U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00771
  • Case Name: Swain v. Premier Dealer Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 28, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Supplement]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 08, 2022: [Objections]
  • March 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 08, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • January 14, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.