U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00770
  • Case Name: Smicklas et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 04, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Docket]
  • August 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 09, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.