U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00779
  • Case Name: Nichols et al v. Gipson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • June 03, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 15, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 11, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 09, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.