U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00784
  • Case Name: Cook v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 04, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • April 15, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 03, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 03, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 10, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.