U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00781
  • Case Name: Pollard v. Katy Express Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 11, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.