U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00793
  • Case Name: Collonade Court LLC v. North Star Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Administrative Closing Order]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 18, 2021: [Enforce]
  • August 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 16, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • August 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.