U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00798
  • Case Name: Zalewski v. Chickasha City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • July 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 10, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 10, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 10, 2022: [Witness List]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 14, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • August 23, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.