U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00808
  • Case Name: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Prime Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 28, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • January 24, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Default]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set Aside Default]
  • December 02, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Default]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 11, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • October 21, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.