U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00811
  • Case Name: Guadiano v. Express Employment Professionals
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Objections]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 22, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • February 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.