U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00819
  • Case Name: Gissandaner v. Nelson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • September 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 14, 2021: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • August 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • August 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.