U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00829
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 10, 2023: [Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 09, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 03, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 15, 2022: [Witness List]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 01, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 18, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.