U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00839
  • Case Name: Greenfield v. Galaviz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Receipt]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Declining Report and Recommendation]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 15, 2021: [Receipt]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 30, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • August 25, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.