U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00874
  • Case Name: Fisher v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 08, 2022: [Objections]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 25, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 25, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.