U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00700
  • Case Name: Oyetunbi v. Wormuth
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 06, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 07, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.