U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00877
  • Case Name: Mays v. Grady County Jail
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 29, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • December 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 01, 2022: [Leave]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 17, 2022: [Special Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • September 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 04, 2022: [Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Response to Non - Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • October 21, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 19, 2021: [Receipt]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 28, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Address Change]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 09, 2021: [Previous Cases]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.