U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00890
  • Case Name: Buchanan v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 03, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 26, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 26, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 01, 2022: [Docket]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 18, 2021: [Leave]
  • October 05, 2021: [Docket]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.