U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00883
  • Case Name: Kirtley v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 10, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.