U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00897
  • Case Name: Unterkircher et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Sealed Reply]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 05, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 14, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Supplement]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 02, 2022: [Leave]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Objections]
  • June 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • May 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 04, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • May 03, 2022: [Protective Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Certification of Issue to State Court]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 25, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • September 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.