U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00904
  • Case Name: Giesler v. Sandridge Energy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Leave]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • December 23, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 02, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • November 24, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.