U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00911
  • Case Name: Romberg v. Walmart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2021: [Docket]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • September 17, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.