U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00900
  • Case Name: Becker v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 11, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.