U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00947
  • Case Name: Weokie Federal Credit Union v. Bodyworx Physical Therapy PLLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • September 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.