U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Grande Oil and Gas Inc v. Gaedeke Oil & Gas Operating LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2022: [Return of Service - NON SUMMONS]
  • September 22, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Quash]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • February 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Counterclaim]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • January 26, 2022: [Counterclaim (Amended)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Leave]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.