U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00963
  • Case Name: Philpott v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • March 23, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • January 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • September 29, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.