U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00970
  • Case Name: Cassar v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 04, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 29, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 29, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • September 30, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.