U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00976
  • Case Name: Wichert v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 11, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Quash]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 10, 2022: [Discovery]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Supplement]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.