U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00982
  • Case Name: Lower v. American Southern Home Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reopen Case]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 02, 2022: [Leave]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 21, 2022: [Substitute Party]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Certificate]
  • October 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • October 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.