U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01001
  • Case Name: Yelton v. Board of County Commissioners of Canadian County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2021: [Withdraw]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • November 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.