U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01006
  • Case Name: Smedlund v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.