U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01012
  • Case Name: Rutledge v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 04, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • May 13, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • April 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2022
  • January 30, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 16, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2021: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • December 09, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • October 18, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.