U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01015
  • Case Name: Midwest Cooling Towers Inc v. Schmidt
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 09, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 08, 2022: [Witness List]
  • September 08, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 08, 2022: [Compel]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 25, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 25, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 25, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 20, 2022: [Docket]
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 04, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 16, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • December 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice from the Court]
  • December 06, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.