U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01017
  • Case Name: Gnapi v. American Farmers & Ranchers Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • September 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Docket]
  • May 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.