U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01035
  • Case Name: McKnight v. Tierra Media Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 27, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 08, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 08, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 02, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Strike]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 14, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Docket]
  • February 21, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.