U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01047
  • Case Name: Wiederstein v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 23, 2023: [Counter Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 21, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 20, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 13, 2023: [Objections]
  • January 13, 2023: [In Limine]
  • January 13, 2023: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 13, 2023: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • January 13, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 27, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 11, 2022: [Docket]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sanctions]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • September 27, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 26, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 01, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Costs]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Costs]
  • November 19, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • November 01, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • October 28, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • October 28, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.