U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01051
  • Case Name: White v. MRS BPO LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Stipulation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Docket]
  • December 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • December 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • November 01, 2021: [Leave]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • October 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.