U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01054
  • Case Name: Results Fitness and Nutrition Center LLC v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 14, 2022: [In Limine]
  • October 07, 2022: [Docket]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • July 12, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • July 07, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • June 16, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • May 18, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 13, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • November 03, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order for Response]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.