U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01060
  • Case Name: Gravdahl v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 10, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 10, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 13, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • June 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 22, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 16, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
  • November 02, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.