U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01073
  • Case Name: Stainsby et al v. Oklahoma Health Care Authority
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 06, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • November 18, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Enforce]
  • October 31, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • October 27, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 27, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 27, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • October 18, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 17, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Compel]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Compel]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Compel]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Docket]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 11, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 08, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.