U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01074
  • Case Name: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 09, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • February 04, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • February 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Issued as to USA]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.