U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01083
  • Case Name: Vanbebber v. Farmers Insurance Company Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Strike]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • November 28, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 17, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 17, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 03, 2022: [Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Docket]
  • November 17, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.