U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01093
  • Case Name: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 15, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 15, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.