U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01067
  • Case Name: Morgan v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • January 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • January 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 05, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 06, 2021: [Receipt]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.