U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01126
  • Case Name: Catherwood v. CCI Corporate Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 04, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.