U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01178
  • Case Name: Cash-Balzer v. Wal Mart Stores East LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • August 01, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • December 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order for Response]
  • December 15, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 15, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 15, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.