U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-01179
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Pharmacists Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Docket]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • December 16, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.